Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Antonio da Cruz, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga

Note/Previous Titular See: (Miguel da Madre de Deus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1739BornVilla da Torre de Moncorvo, Portugal
24 Sep 176324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
15 Jul 179152.1SelectedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
19 Dec 179152.6ConfirmedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
29 Apr 179252.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
22 Jan 179555.7ResignedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
1 Dec 181475.5SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
4 Sep 181576.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
20 Aug 182788.2DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Miguel Antonio da Cruz
Archbishop Miguel Antonio da Cruz O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016