Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilherme de São José Antonio de Aranha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil

Note/Previous Titular See: (Ordre du Christ)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1686³Born
7 Sep 171629.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 173851.5SelectedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
3 Sep 173851.6ConfirmedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
14 Dec 173851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
18 May 174861.3ResignedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
15 Dec 175164.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guilherme de São José Antonio de Aranha
Bishop Guilherme de São José Antonio de Aranha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,738, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast