Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de São José de Queiroz da Silveira, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1711Born
19 Jan 172917.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Sep 173423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Nov 175948.3SelectedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
24 Mar 176048.6ConfirmedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
10 May 176048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
25 Nov 176352.3ResignedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
15 Aug 176453.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João de São José de Queiroz da Silveira
Bishop João de São José de Queiroz da Silveira O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatosinhos, Portugal

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017