Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Bragança

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1703Born
22 Feb 173935.7SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
19 Dec 174037.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
5 Feb 174137.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Jun 175653.0DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José de Bragança
Archbishop José de Bragança (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017