Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Sabatucci

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Argentina

Titular Archbishop of Antinoë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1835Born
19 Dec 185722.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 189055.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
1 Oct 189055.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thebae
26 Oct 189055.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thebae
14 Mar 189256.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antinoë
31 Dec 189560.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
24 Apr 190065.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Argentina
24 Oct 190065.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Uruguay
24 Oct 190065.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Paraguay
9 Nov 190671.6ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Argentina
9 Nov 190671.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Uruguay
9 Nov 190671.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Paraguay
31 Dec 192085.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Argentina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sabatucci
Archbishop Antonio Sabatucci (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Argentina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 546
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 71
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 40, and Page 41, and Page 97
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 98, and Page 198, and Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast