Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilherme Müller

Deceased

Bishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1877Born
8 Jul 190023.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 192548.4AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
22 Aug 192649.1Ordained BishopBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
11 Dec 193558.4DiedBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Guilherme Müller
Bishop Guilherme Müller (born , died ) Bishop of Barra do Piraí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRicado do Serro Alegre

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast