Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Damiano

Coadjutor Archbishop of Agrigento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1960 Born
25 Oct 198626.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trapani, Italy
24 Apr 198726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trapani, Italy
30 Apr 202059.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Agrigento, Italy
5 Sep 202060.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Agrigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Damiano
Archbishop Alessandro Damiano (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Agrigento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrapani, Diocese of Trapani
Ordained DeaconSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Trapani, Diocese of Trapani
Ordained BishopSan Gerlando, Cathedral, Agrigento, Archdiocese of Agrigento

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Agrigento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2020
  • od/c01: AM, 30 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Sep 2020

Quantcast