Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Traian Crisan

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Titular Bishop of Drivastum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1918Born
25 Mar 194526.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 198163.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
7 Dec 198163.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Drivastum
6 Jan 198263.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drivastum
24 Feb 199071.7ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
6 Nov 199072.4DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

MicroData Summary for Traian Crisan
Archbishop Traian Crisan (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Causes of Saints

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIara, Romania

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast