Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gílio Felício

Bishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1949 Born
11 Nov 197930.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
21 Jan 199848.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
21 Jan 199848.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Illiberi
3 May 199848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Illiberi
11 Dec 200253.0AppointedBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
9 Mar 200353.3InstalledBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gílio Felício
Bishop Gílio Felício (born ) Bishop of Bagé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSério

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bagé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,273
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018