Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Biernaski

Bishop of Blumenau, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1955 BornCuritiba
13 Dec 198126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
10 Feb 201054.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
10 Feb 201054.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
15 Apr 201054.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
24 Jun 201559.6AppointedBishop of Blumenau, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rafael Biernaski:
Bishop Rafael Biernaski (born ) Bishop of Blumenau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Blumenau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,623
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 24 Jun 2015