Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Monetti

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1817Born
19 Sep 184022.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 186042.2AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
15 Apr 186042.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
30 Oct 186042.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
1861¹43.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
15 Feb 187759.1DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Monetti (VIAF: 304914309)
Bishop Giovanni Monetti (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonzano, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017