Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria delli Guidelli Guidi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Modena (e Nonantola)

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1833BornModena
2 Jun 186026.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187238.7AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
12 May 187238.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
May 1889³55.7ResignedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
24 May 188955.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
9 May 189965.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria delli Guidelli Guidi:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria delli Guidelli Guidi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 398, and Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013