Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martial-Guillaume-Marie Testard du Cosquer

Deceased

Archbishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1820Born
22 Apr 184827.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 186141.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
7 Sep 186342.9SelectedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti
1 Oct 186343.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti
18 Oct 186343.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti
9 Jun 186443.7InstalledArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti
27 Jul 186948.8DiedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Ha´ti

MicroData Summary for Martial-Guillaume-Marie Testard du Cosquer (VIAF: 120169496)
Archbishop Martial-Guillaume-Marie Testard du Cosquer (born , died ) Archbishop of Port-au-Prince

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLesneven, France
Ordained BishopSS. Jean et Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 467
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1863, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017