Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Carlo Belgrado

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1809BornUdine
6 Nov 183122.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 185546.4AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
20 Jan 185646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
25 Jan 186050.7ResignedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
21 May 186253.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
18 Feb 186656.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Belgrado:
Patriarch Carlo Belgrado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013