Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Giuseppe Pluym, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1808Born
24 Oct 183224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
15 Sep 186354.9AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
18 Oct 186355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
23 Feb 187061.3ResignedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
23 Feb 187061.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
13 Jan 187465.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Antonio Giuseppe Pluym
Archbishop Antonio Giuseppe Pluym C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotterdam
Ordained BishopSS. Jean et Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 413, and Page 573
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017