Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-Désiré Guiot, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino)

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1860BornPontchâteau, France
8 Dec 188424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
3 Apr 190847.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino), Colombia
3 Apr 190847.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
28 May 190847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
27 Jun 193978.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino), Colombia
24 Dec 194181.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino), Colombia

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Désiré Guiot:
Bishop Joseph-Marie-Désiré Guiot S.M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino)

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 73
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013