Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Burkhard Huwiler, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bukoba, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Vazari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1868Born
2 Jul 189325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
18 Mar 192960.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bukoba, Tanzania
18 Mar 192960.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari
14 Jul 192961.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari
20 Mar 194677.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bukoba, Tanzania
1 Oct 195486.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bukoba, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Burkhard Huwiler
Bishop Burkhard Huwiler M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bukoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceButtwil-Argau, Switzerland

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2+/d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018