Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Auguste-Laurent-Marie Roy, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangueolo

Titular Bishop of Ambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1895BornMortagne-sur-Sèvre
2 Feb 192024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
28 May 193438.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Bangueolo, Zambia
28 May 193438.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ambia
8 Sep 193439.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ambia
5 Oct 193540.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Bangueolo, Zambia
10 Mar 194953.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bangueolo, Zambia
10 Feb 198488.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangueolo, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Auguste-Laurent-Marie Roy:
Bishop Alexandre-Auguste-Laurent-Marie Roy M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangueolo

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013