Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthieu Marie Jean Rougé

Bishop of Nanterre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1966 Born
19 Sep 199327.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
25 Jun 199428.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
5 Jun 201852.4AppointedBishop of Nanterre, France
16 Sep 201852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nanterre, France

MicroData Summary for Matthieu Marie Jean Rougé (VIAF: 14937943)
Bishop Matthieu Marie Jean Rougé (born ) Bishop of Nanterre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-sur-Seine, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSainte-Geneviève-Saint Maurice, Cathedral, Nanterre, Diocese of Nanterre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nanterre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2018
  • c1/ob: CB, 5 Jun 2018
  • od/c0234: AJ, 15 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 16 Sep 2018

Quantcast