Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriel Cardinal de Gramont

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Bishop of Poitiers

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1486BornGascony
25 Jun 151529.5AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
19 Sep 152438.7AppointedBishop of Tarbes, France
14 Jul 152943.5SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
24 Sep 152943.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
9 Mar 153044.2ResignedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
8 Jun 153044.4Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 153044.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
9 Jan 153145.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
13 Jan 153246.0AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
17 Oct 153347.8AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
26 Mar 153448.2DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Gramont:
Cardinal Gabriel de Gramont (died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a cardinal for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Jun 1530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013