Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César-Victor-Ange-Jean-Baptiste Jourdan

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1813Born
18 Apr 184026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
4 Dec 187461.1SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
21 Dec 187461.2ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
24 Feb 187561.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
16 Jul 188268.7DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

MicroData Summary for César-Victor-Ange-Jean-Baptiste Jourdan (VIAF: 88632143)
Bishop César-Victor-Ange-Jean-Baptiste Jourdan (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, Diocese of Marseille
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 535
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017