Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien-Louis-Claude Martin

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1883Born
8 Jul 190623.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 193552.3AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
17 Sep 193552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
26 Dec 194562.9DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Lucien-Louis-Claude Martin
Bishop Lucien-Louis-Claude Martin (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontenoy

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018