Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Fontanges

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1744BornGannat
15 Jun 178339.2SelectedBishop of Nancy, France
18 Jul 178339.3ConfirmedBishop of Nancy, France
17 Aug 178339.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy, France
14 Oct 178743.5SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
15 Dec 178743.7ResignedBishop of Nancy, France
17 Dec 178743.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
3 Feb 178843.9InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
30 Mar 178844.0SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
12 Sep 178844.5ResignedArchbishop of Bourges, France
15 Sep 178844.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
24 Feb 178944.9InstalledArchbishop of Toulouse, France
5 Nov 180157.6ResignedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
17 Oct 180258.6SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Autun, France
20 Dec 180258.7ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Autun, France
30 Mar 180359.0InstalledBishop of Autun, France
26 Jan 180661.8DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for François de Fontanges:
Archbishop François de Fontanges (born , died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 60
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 124, and Page 300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016