Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Seignelay (Charles) Colbert (Cuthbert) de Castle Hill

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1735³Born
1762²26.3Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse, France
28 Jan 178145.4SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
2 Apr 178145.6ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
22 Apr 178145.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
2 Sep 178146.0InstalledBishop of Rodez, France
15 Jul 181175.9DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Seignelay (Charles) Colbert (Cuthbert) de Castle Hill (VIAF: 69040165)
Bishop Seignelay (Charles) Colbert (Cuthbert) de Castle Hill (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle Hill, Inverness, Scotland, Vicariate Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
Ordained PriestParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceHouse of Lord Gray, Twickenham, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Saint Pancras, Cemetery, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Mar 2019

Quantcast