Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice Lucien Fréchard, C.S.Sp.

Archbishop Emeritus of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1928 BornNancy
3 Jul 195527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Sep 199668.2AppointedArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
27 Oct 199668.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
21 Dec 200476.5RetiredArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France

MicroData Summary for Maurice Lucien Fréchard:
Archbishop Maurice Lucien Fréchard C.S.Sp. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013