Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Nicolas-Michel Krick, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lhassa, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1819Born
1 Jun 184425.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 184829.6ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
7 Nov 185233.6AppointedPrefect of Lhassa, China
1 Sep 185435.5DiedPrefect of Lhassa, China

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Michel Krick
Father Nicolas-Michel Krick M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Lhassa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLixheim, Diocese of Nancy, France
Death PlaceSomme, Lohit, Arunanchal Pradesh, India

  • a priest for 10.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 13 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast