Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantino Barrera Morales

Bishop of Sonsonate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1963 BornCantón Rojita
8 Dec 199027.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Vicente, El Salvador
11 Jun 201248.5AppointedBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador
4 Aug 201248.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Constantino Barrera Morales:
Bishop Constantino Barrera Morales (born ) Bishop of Sonsonate

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sonsonate.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,523

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013