Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Alas Alfaro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chalatenango, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1930Born
30 Oct 196030.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 198757.4AppointedBishop of Chalatenango, El Salvador
27 Feb 198857.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chalatenango, El Salvador
21 Apr 200776.8RetiredBishop of Chalatenango, El Salvador
27 Feb 202089.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chalatenango, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Alas Alfaro
Bishop Eduardo Alas Alfaro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chalatenango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Rafael
Ordained BishopChalatenango, Diocese of Chalatenango
Death PlaceChalatenango, Diocese of Chalatenango
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Chalatenango, Diocese of Chalatenango

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,234
  • d: CB, 27 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast