Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Ortiz y Urruela

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1818Born
29 Sep 184425.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 186647.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
25 Jun 186647.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
Jul 1866²47.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
6 Jun 187354.6DiedCoadjutor Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Ortiz y Urruela
Bishop Mariano Ortiz y Urruela (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of San Salvador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala City, Guatemala

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 495, and Page 539
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017