Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Campo y Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1794BornCartagena, Spain
1817¹22.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 184449.1AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
12 Jan 184550.1Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
185358.1DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Campo y Pérez:
Bishop Francisco de Paula Campo y Pérez (born ) Bishop of Comayagua

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013