Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Gregorio Cardinal Rosa Chávez

Auxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Sacramento a Tor de’ Schiavi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1942 Born
24 Jan 197027.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Miguel, El Salvador
17 Feb 198239.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
17 Feb 198239.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulli
3 Jul 198239.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulli
28 Jun 201774.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201774.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Sacramento a Tor de’ Schiavi
2 Jul 201774.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Sacramento a Tor de’ Schiavi

MicroData Summary for José Gregorio Rosa Chávez (VIAF: 193468779)
José Gregorio Cardinal Rosa Chávez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Salvador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSociedad, Archdiocese of San Salvador
Ordained PriestCathedral, San Miguel, Diocese of San Miguel
Ordained BishopMaría Auxiliadora, Church, San Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of San Salvador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • card: CB, 21 May 2017
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017
  • i: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jun 2017