Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stjepan Pavlović-Lučić

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1790BornMakarska
21 Aug 181424.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 182736.8SelectedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
28 Jan 182837.4ConfirmedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
4 May 182837.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
27 Feb 185362.5DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Stjepan Pavlović-Lučić (VIAF: 305794561)
Bishop Stjepan Pavlović-Lučić (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016