Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Philipp Cardinal von Lamberg

Deceased

Bishop of Passau

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1652BornWien
25 May 168937.0SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
11 Jan 169037.6ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
14 May 169037.9Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
21 Jun 170048.0Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 170148.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
21 Oct 171260.4DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp von Lamberg:
Johann Philipp Cardinal von Lamberg (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Jun 1700
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1690, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015