Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Leonhard von Thun

Deceased

Bishop of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1748³BornPraha
20 May 177022.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Passau, Germany
10 Sep 177123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
13 Dec 179648.6SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
24 Jul 179749.2ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
27 Aug 179749.3Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
22 Oct 182678.5DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leopold Leonhard von Thun
Bishop Leopold Leonhard von Thun (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016