Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Karl Kajetan Cardinal von Gaisruck (Gaysruck)

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1769³BornKlagenfurt, Austria
23 Dec 179728.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Passau, Germany
6 Jul 180030.9Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
20 Jul 180132.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
20 Jul 180132.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
23 Aug 180132.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
1 Mar 181848.6SelectedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Mar 181848.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Sep 182455.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 182959.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marco
19 Nov 184677.3DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Kajetan von Gaisruck (Gaysruck):
Cardinal Karl Kajetan von Gaisruck (Gaysruck) (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
  • a cardinal for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 174, and Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013