Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Maria Pagani

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1755Born
13 Jun 177823.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 181661.1SelectedBishop of Lodi, Italy
27 Sep 181964.4ConfirmedBishop of Lodi, Italy
19 Dec 181964.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
27 Jun 183580.2DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Maria Pagani
Bishop Alessandro Maria Pagani (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018