Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Ronna

Deceased

Bishop of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1767BornMilan
18 Dec 179023.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Jun 179124.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180740.5AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
27 Dec 180740.8Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
23 Apr 182861.1DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Ronna:
Bishop Tommaso Ronna (born , died ) Bishop of Crema

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013