Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Codronchi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1748BornImola
21 Sep 177123.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 178536.5AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
8 May 178536.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
22 Jan 182677.5DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Codronchi:
Archbishop Antonio Codronchi (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 353
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013