Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Bonsignore

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1738Born
28 Sep 176022.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Dec 176022.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180769.5AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
27 Dec 180769.8Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
23 Dec 182688.8DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Bonsignore
Bishop Stefano Bonsignore (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBusto

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,807, Number 25
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast