Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Crispino Mazzotti

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1759Born
21 Dec 178223.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 181858.3AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
31 May 181858.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
21 Feb 182060.3AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
2 Nov 182566.0DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Crispino Mazzotti
Bishop Giuseppe Crispino Mazzotti (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,522
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 146, and Page 369
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018