Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Giovanni Battista Giuseppe Cerina, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sergiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1748BornCosia, Italy
19 Sep 177223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Sep 180354.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
2 Oct 180354.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
30 May 182778.5DiedTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Giovanni Battista Giuseppe Cerina:
Bishop Eugenio Giovanni Battista Giuseppe Cerina O.F.M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Sergiopolis

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013