Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francesco Milesi

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1744BornVenezia
25 Mar 176723.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 180762.8SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
18 Sep 180763.5ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
1 Nov 180763.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
8 Dec 181571.7SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
23 Sep 181672.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
18 Sep 181975.5DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Milesi:
Patriarch Francesco Milesi (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,311
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 391, and Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013