Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Baldassare Rasponti

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1758Born
22 Sep 178122.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180748.9AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
27 Dec 180749.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Udine, Italy
14 Feb 181455.3DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Baldassare Rasponti
Archbishop Baldassare Rasponti (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 27
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast