Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Lamberto D’Allègre

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1751Born
24 Sep 177422.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Mar 177523.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180755.9AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
1 Nov 180756.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
6 Oct 182169.9DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Lamberto D’Allègre
Bishop Paolo Lamberto D’Allègre (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,309
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast