Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabrio Maria Nava

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1758BornBarzan˛
30 Mar 178224.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 May 178224.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180749.4AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
1 Nov 180749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brescia, Italy
2 Nov 183173.5DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabrio Maria Nava:
Bishop Gabrio Maria Nava (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,310
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013