Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Laurenz (Johannes Franz Ignatius) Mauermann, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

Titular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1780BornNeuzelle
1 Nov 179717.7ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
20 Sep 180323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
Apr 1817³37.2IncardinatedPriest of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
26 Nov 184161.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
26 Nov 184161.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
6 Mar 184262.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
25 Oct 184565.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Laurenz (Johannes Franz Ignatius) Mauermann:
Bishop Franz Laurenz (Johannes Franz Ignatius) Mauermann O. Cist. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 317
  • b: CB, 7 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015