Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godfried Joseph Crüts van Creits

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten

Bishop of Austria, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1757³BornMaastricht, Netherlands
12 Sep 178427.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
18 Sep 178427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
178628.8IncardinatedPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
28 Jul 180346.4AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
14 Mar 180649.0SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
26 Aug 180649.5ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
5 Oct 180649.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
5 Apr 181558.1DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Godfried Joseph Crüts van Creits:
Bishop Godfried Joseph Crüts van Creits (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013