Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Godefried von Rosenthal

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1738Born
16 May 176122.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc, Czech Republic
4 Oct 176123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
1 Mar 177940.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
1 Mar 177940.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
22 Mar 177940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
25 May 180061.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karl Godefried von Rosenthal
Bishop Karl Godefried von Rosenthal (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZlabings

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,710
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast