Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Felix Ciurletti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1696BornTrento
29 Jan 171922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
7 Sep 174448.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
7 Sep 174448.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
11 Oct 174448.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
5 Jan 175558.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Anton Felix Ciurletti:
Bishop Anton Felix Ciurletti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013