Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Maria Joseph von Spaur

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1696BornInnsbruck
24 Sep 171822.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
16 Apr 171922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
18 Oct 174751.4SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
19 Feb 174851.7ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
28 Apr 174851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
31 Dec 177882.6DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leopold Maria Joseph von Spaur:
Bishop Leopold Maria Joseph von Spaur (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015